Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471668

EP3471668 - LID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
22.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ostomycure AS
Gaustadalleen 21
0349 Oslo / NO
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CARDELL, Mats Erik Kindahl
Brunkebergsåsen 1A
SE-192 66 Sollentuna / SE
02 / ELWING, Erik
Andréevägen 24
SE-554 66 Jönköping / SE
03 / SCHÖN, Jimmy Gidö
c/o ConceptoMed AS
Box 10
NO-8373 Ballstad / NO
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date17733756.515.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64695
Priority number, dateGB2016001052716.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610527
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017216302
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3471668
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/445, A61F5/44
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DECKEL[2019/17]
English:LID[2019/17]
French:BOUCHON[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase06.12.2018National basic fee paid 
06.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
06.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)EP19157149.6  / EP3513772
EP19157186.8  / EP3508179
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDI]WO2011039517  (OSTOMYCURE AS [NO], et al) [XD] 1,3,5,6,8-10,14-19,23,24 * page 13, line 1 - page 17, line 17; figure - * [I] 4,7,11-13;
 [X]EP2424473  (OSTOMYCURE AS [NO]) [X] 1-3,8-10,14-24 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figures 8,9 *;
 [X]WO2006046210  (STOMIPRODUKTER AS [NO], et al) [X] 17,19 * page 10, line 7 - page 12, line 12; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB191105362  (TRITSCH OSKAR [CH]) [X] 17-19 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2012179124  (NGUYEN-DEMARY TINH [US], et al) [X] 20-23 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086]; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2015209173  (KRATKY PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0059]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US5041102  (STEER PETER L [GB], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 31 - line 45; figure 1 *