Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465242

EP3465242 - DC PULSE BATTERY TESTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A BATTERY TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berghof Automation GmbH
Langensalzaer Landstraße 23
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / MISKA, Philipp
Unter dem Scherbenberg 6
99998 Weinbergen / DE
02 / GÖRLS, Christopher
Bergstrasse 174
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Forstmeyer, Dietmar , et al
BOETERS & LIECK
Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17733974.431.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017EP63190
Priority number, dateDE2016100641931.05.2016         Original published format: DE102016006419
[2019/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207650
Date:07.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465242
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/36, H01M10/42
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:GLEICHSTROMIMPULS-BATTERIETESTGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG EINES BATTERIETYPS[2019/15]
English:DC PULSE BATTERY TESTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A BATTERY TYPE[2019/15]
French:APPAREIL DE TEST DE BATTERIE À IMPULSION DE COURANT CONTINU ET PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE D'UN TYPE DE BATTERIE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US5489835  (STEPHENS CHARLES S [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * figures 1-5 * * claims 1,5,6 * * column 1, line 9 - line 10 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 63 *;
 [I]US2012235593  (SNYDER MARK W [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * figure 9B * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0114] *;
 [I]DE69424696T  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [I] 1-18 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 5 *;
 [A]US2016018471  (LEE TAE-KYUNG [US]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102010062412  (LEAR CORP [US]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1065774  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6404164  (BEAN HEATHER N [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008309284  (CHOKSI SNEHAL [US], et al) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *