Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469051

EP3469051 - CHLORINE DIOXIDE DISINFECTING CLOTH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alethia Life Sciences AG
Unterlettenstr. 14
9443 Widnau / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / OBERWALDER, Sebastian
Implerstr. 38
81371 München / DE
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kiwit, Benedikt
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733987.609.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64101
Priority number, dateDE2016100708110.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016007081
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212024
Date:14.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469051
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/04, C11D3/48, C11D17/04, A61L2/18, A61L2/232
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:CHLORDIOXID DESINFEKTIONSTUCH[2019/16]
English:CHLORINE DIOXIDE DISINFECTING CLOTH[2019/16]
French:LINGETTE DÉSINFECTANTE À BASE DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP0423817  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [I] 1-8,10,11 * column 5, line 50 - line 51; example 2; claims 1-3, 12-18, 20, 3136 * [Y] 11;
 [I]WO2008065551  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al) [I] 1-5,7-10 * page 20, line 8 - line 15 * * page 21, line 26 - page 22, line 16; figure 4/4; claims 1, 7, 13, 20 *;
 [Y]US2006051266  (GREEN BRUCE P [GB], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 31] , [0 36] , [0 51] , [0 55]; claims 1, 8, 9 *;
 [A]WO2015191811  (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [A] 6 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 10; claims 1, 6-8, 11-16 *;
 [XP]WO2016102606  (FLEXIBLE MEDICAL PACKAGING LTD [GB]) [XP] 1-6,10,11 * page 5, paragraph 5; figure 3/4; example 1; claims 1, 13-19, 22-24, 26, 31, 32, 35, 38 * * page 8, paragraphs 2-6 * * page 13, paragraph 3 *
by applicantWO2005107823
 US2014142489
 WO2015040366