Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469091

EP3469091 - METHOD FOR STABILIZING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lonza Ltd
Lonzastrasse
3930 Visp / CH
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KHAN, Mohsam
65 Middle Way
WATFORD
Watford, WD24 6HJ / GB
02 / PORTER, Alison
228 Bath Road
Slough SL1 4DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]01 / KHAN, Mohsam
22 Bath Road
Slough SL1 4DX / GB
02 / PORTER, Alison
228 Bath Road
Slough SL1 4DX / GB
Representative(s)Greiner, Elisabeth
df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Theatinerstraße 16
80333 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17733993.412.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017EP64313
Priority number, dateUS201662348595P10.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662348595 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212071
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469091
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12P21/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON PROTEINEN[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR STABILIZING PROTEINS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION DE PROTÉINES[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
10.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1489188  (ENDO YAETA DR [JP]) [X] 2,3,65-95 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0 10] , [0 18] , [0 44] , [0 46] - [0048] * * examples 4-7 *;
 [X]WO2013050034  (STATENS SERUMINSTITUT [DK]) [X] 2,3,65-95 * abstract * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 11 * * page 12, line 20 - page 15, line 2 *
by applicantUS6703199
 US2016097074
 US2013280797
 US2012077429
 US2011280797
 US2009305626
 US8298054
 US7629167
 US5656491
 US9670446
 US2011312087
 US5633162
 EP0481791
    - HOLLINGER; HUDSON, Nature Biotechnology, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136
    - LEADER et al., "Protein therapeutics: a summary and pharmacological classification", Nature Reviews Drug Discovery, (20080000), vol. 7, pages 21 - 39
    - WALSH, "Biopharmaceutical benchmarks 2014", Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 992 - 1000
    - HOLMGREN et al., Biochem Soc Trans., (20051200), vol. 33, pages 1375 - 7
    - NORDBERG; ARNER, Free Radic Biol Med, (20011201), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1287 - 312
    - GHEZZI P., Biochem Soc Trans., (20051200), vol. 33, pages 1378 - 81
    - IVARSSON et al., Diabetes, (20050700), vol. 54, no. 7, pages 2132 - 42
    - SEN, CK, Biochem Pharmacol, (19980601), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 1747 - 1758
    - MAY et al., J Biol Chem, (19970905), vol. 272, no. 36, pages 22607 - 10
    - MOLTENI, S. N. et al., "Glutathione limits Erol-dependent oxidation in the endoplasmic reticulum", Journal of Biological Chemistry, (20040000), vol. 279, no. 31, pages 32667 - 32673
    - KOJER, K.; J. RIEMER, "Balancing oxidative protein folding: The influences of reducing pathways on disulfide bond formation", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta - Proteins and Proteomics, (20140000), vol. 1844, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbapap.2014.02.004, pages 1383 - 1390, XP028849465

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbapap.2014.02.004
    - HANSCHMANN, E.-M. et al., "Thioredoxins, Glutaredoxins, and Peroxiredoxins—Molecular Mechanisms and Health Significance: from Cofactors to Antioxidants to Redox Signaling", Antioxidants & Redox Signaling, (20130000), vol. 19, no. 13, pages 1539 - 1605
    - CHAKRAVARTHI, S et al., "The role of glutathione in disulphide bond formation and endoplasmic-reticulum-generated oxidative stress.", EMBO Reports, (20060000), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 271 - 275
    - FLOHE, L., "The fairytale of the GSSG/GSH redox potential", Biochimica et Biophysica Acta - General Subjects, (20130000), vol. 1830, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbagen.2012.10.020, pages 3139 - 3142, XP028529796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2012.10.020
    - BANHEGYI, G. et al., "Stress on redox", FEBS Letters, (20070000), vol. 581, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.febslet.2007.04.028, pages 3634 - 3640, XP022191488

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2007.04.028
    - NORDBERG; ARNER, Free Radic Biol Med., (20011201), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 1287 - 312
    - SEN, CK., Biochem Pharmacol, (19980601), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 1747 - 1758
    - MAY et al., J Biol Chem., (19970905), vol. 272, no. 36, pages 22607 - 10
    - RAUSCH; HASTINGS, Mol Immunol., (20151200), vol. 68, pages 124 - 8
    - HASTINGS; CRESSWELL, Antioxid Redox Signal, (20110801), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 657 - 668
    - WINKLER et al., Free Radic Biol Med., (19941000), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 333 - 49
    - SCHWARZLANDER M et al., Antioxid Redox Signal., (20160501), vol. 24, no. 13, pages 680 - 712
    - MORRE, G., The Journal of the American Medical Association, (19670000), vol. 199, page 519
    - LEIBOVITZ, A. et al., Amer. J. of Hygiene, (19630000), vol. 78, page 173 ff
    - HAM, R. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sc., (19650000), vol. 53, page 288
    - ISCOVES et al., J. Exp. med., (19780000), vol. 1, page 923
    - SMALES et al., Biotechnology Bioengineering, (20040000), vol. 88, pages 474 - 488
    - MASON et al., Biotechnology Progress, (20120000), vol. 28, pages 846 - 855
    - STANSFIELD et al., Biotechnology Bioengineering, (20070000), vol. 97, pages 410 - 424
    - PORTER et al., Biotechnology Progress, (20100000), vol. 26, pages 1446 - 1455