Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472752

EP3472752 - IMAGE PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  11.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
11.09.2019New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snell Advanced Media Limited
31 Turnpike Road
Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2NX / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DIGGINS, Jonathan
12 Lensyd Gardens
Lovedean Hampshire PO8 9SJ / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Leach, Sean Adam
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734134.416.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB51772
Priority number, dateGB2016001066417.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610664
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216582
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472752
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00, G06K9/46
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:BILDVERARBEITUNG[2019/17]
English:IMAGE PROCESSING[2019/17]
French:TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2018National basic fee paid 
12.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
12.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
12.09.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[T]  - YONG JAE LEE ET AL, "Foreground Focus: Unsupervised Learning from Partially Matching Images", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20090527), vol. 85, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S11263-009-0252-Y, ISSN 1573-1405, pages 143 - 166, XP019734457 [T] 1-4,37,38 * abstract * * page 147, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 149, column r, paragraph l - page 150, column l, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11263-009-0252-y