Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2018006994

WO2018006994 - DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE INSTANT STEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2019PCT data prior to European publication 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innosteam Swiss SA
Chemin des Loveresses 5
1523 Granges-Près-Marnand / CH
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / FERRINI, Olivier
Route de Corcelles 3
1059 Peney-le-Jorat / CH
[N/P]
Representative(s)Helbig, Christian
Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date17734239.127.06.2017
WO2017EP00746
Priority number, dateEP2016000149305.07.2016         Original published format: EP 16001493
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018006994
Date:11.01.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018
[2018/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:D06F39/00, D06F75/12, D06F87/00, F22B1/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SOFORTIGEN ERZEUGUNG VON DAMPF
English:DEVICE AND METHOD TO PRODUCE INSTANT STEAM
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DE LA VAPEUR INSTANTANÉE
Entry into regional phase04.02.2019National basic fee paid 
04.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2016067031  (WHITBREAD MARTIN [GB]; BRADING JARED [GB]) [X] 1,14,23 * the whole document * [Y] 2-13,15-22,24;
 [XY]CN105202510  (CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO LTD) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [Y] 2-13,15-24;
 [XY]EP1975308  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,14,24 * paragraph [0024]; figure - * [Y] 2-13,15-23;
 [A]EP1831449  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-24 * paragraph [0033]; figure - *