Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472456

EP3472456 - WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH TIP END SERRATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LM Wind Power International Technology II ApS
Jupitervej 6
6000 Kolding / DK
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCE, Carlos
Broagervej 15
6000 Kolding / DK
02 / MADSEN, Jesper
Andstvej 8
6621 Gesten / DK
03 / HERTEL NILSSON VAN KALKEN, Jordy
Mosevangen 14
6640 Lunderskov / DK
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)COPA Copenhagen Patents
Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor
1970 Frederiksberg C / DK
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734267.220.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP65113
Priority number, dateEP2016017518620.06.2016         Original published format: EP 16175186
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220594
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472456
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F03D1/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Validation statesMA15.01.2019
TitleGerman:WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT SPITZENENDENVERZAHNUNGEN[2019/17]
English:WIND TURBINE BLADE WITH TIP END SERRATIONS[2019/17]
French:PALE D'ÉOLIENNE DOTÉE DE DENTELURES D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE POINTE.[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XDI]US2012027590  (BONNET LAURENT [DE]) [XD] 1-3,5-11,15,16 * figures 2, 6 * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] * [I] 4,12-14;
 [ID]US5533865  (DASSEN ANTONIUS G M [NL], et al) [ID] 1-15 * figures 1, 7 * * column 2, line 18 - line 19 *;
 [XD]WO2014086564  (WOBBEN PROPERTIES GMBH [DE]) [XD] 16 * figures 2-4 *;
 [XD]US2009074585  (KOEGLER KLAUS U [DE], et al) [XD] 16 * figures 2-8 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0041] *;
 [X]US2013149162  (SMITH GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 16 * figures 2-5 * * paragraph [0022] *
by applicantUS2009074585
 WO2014086564
 WO2014086919
 US2012027590
 US5533865