Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472455

EP3472455 - CONTROL OR PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Power Enable Solutions Limited
Murchison House
10 Max Born Crescent
Edinburgh
EH9 3BF / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SUBIABRE, Estanislao Juan Pablo Echenique
16/5 Blacket Avenue
Edinburgh EH9 1RS / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hindles Limited
Clarence House
131-135 George Street
Edinburgh, EH2 4JS / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734407.420.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB51800
Priority number, dateGB2016001079821.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610798
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220994
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472455
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F03B15/00, F03D7/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:STEUER- ODER VERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:CONTROL OR PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE OU DE TRAITEMENT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
21.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2918824  (GAMESA INNOVATION & TECH SL [ES]) [X] 1-5,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]WO2014194914  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1,2,5-15 * abstract * * page 2, lines 15-19 * * page 7, lines 22-23 * * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 11 * * page 15, lines 20-22 * * figures 1-17 *;
 [X]EP2336558  (GAMESA INNOVATION & TECH SL [ES]) [X] 1,2,10-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * figures 1-8 *;
 [X]EP2736164  (ARISTOTLE UNIVERSITY OF THESSALONIKI RES COMMITTEE [GR], et al) [X] 1,2,10-15 * the whole document *