Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472266

EP3472266 - PYROLYSIS FEEDSTOCK CONDITIONING COMPRISING DRYER AND SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngas Products Limited
Energy Site Control Centre
Arena Way
Magma Road
Wimbourne, Dorset BH21 3BW / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HARRADINE, Mark
17 Milestone Road
Oakdale
Poole Dorset BH15 3DR / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734415.720.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB51813
Priority number, dateGB2016001084321.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610843
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221006
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472266
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C10B57/08, C10B53/00, F26B23/10, B07B4/06, F26B3/20, F26B17/04
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUFBEREITUNG VON PYROLYSEAUSGANGSATERIAL MIT TROCKNER UND ABSCHEIDER[2019/17]
English:PYROLYSIS FEEDSTOCK CONDITIONING COMPRISING DRYER AND SEPARATOR[2019/17]
French:CONDITIONNEMENT D'UNE CHARGE D'ALIMENTATION DE PYROLYSE COMPRENANT UN SÉCHOIR ET UN SÉPARATEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2011097680  (KAUTTO JORMA [FI]) [I] 1-11,20,21 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] *;
 [I]WO2005043057  (RAUMASTER OY [FI]; UPM KYMMENE OYJ [FI]; SAARELA ESKO [FI]; KINNUNEN J) [I] 1-11,20,21 * figures 1-7 * * claims 1-16 *;
 [Y]GB2503065  (RECYCLING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [Y] 21-23 * figure 1 * * page 30, line 13 - page 32, line 7 *;
 [A]GB207809  (KOHLENVEREDLUNG GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRÄNKTER HAFTUNG) [A] 1-11,20,21 * claims 1-7 * * page 1, lines 61-87 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]  - Sol Environment ET AL, "EPR SWIP PERMIT APPLICATION SUPPORT DOCUMENT Syngas Products Ltd Canford Low Carbon Energy Facility", (20151001), page 9372811, URL: http://www.poole.gov.uk/EasysiteWeb/getresource.axd?AssetID=32519&type=full&servicetype=Attachment, (20170810), XP055398145 [Y] 21-23 * Fig 1.3 * * page 13 "3.3 Infrastructure and Design" * * page 1, 5th full paragraph * * page 2, first-fourth paragraph *