Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464485

EP3464485 - COATINGS CONTAINING POLYESTER MACROMERS CONTAINING 1,1-DICARBONYL-SUBSTITUTED 1 ALKENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
30.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sirrus, Inc.
422 Wards Corner Road
Loveland, OH 45140 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PALSULE, Aniruddha S.
2629 Ridgecliff Avenue
Cincinnati OH 45212 / US
02 / SULLIVAN, Jeffrey M.
6174 State Route 132
Goshen OH 45122 / US
03 / VANDERPOOL, Katherine E.
210 Elm Street
Milford OH 45150 / US
04 / HOLZER, Alexander R.
7101 Wallace Avenue
Cincinnati OH 45243 / US
05 / DESHPANDE, Anushree
11630 Currier Lane
Apt F
Cincinnati OH 45249 / US
06 / KLIER, John
33 Lead Mine Road
Leverett MA 01054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]01 / PALSULE, Aniruddha S.
2629 Ridgecliff Avenue
Cincinnati OH 45212 / US
02 / SULLIVAN, Jeffrey M.
6174 State Route 132
Goshen OH 45122 / US
03 / VANDERPOOL, Katherine E.
210 Elm Street
Milford OH 45150 / US
04 / HOLZER, Alexander R.
7101 Wallace Avenue
Cincinnati OH 45243 / US
05 / DESHPANDE, Anushree
3505 Telford Street Apt. 3
Cincinnati OH 45220 / US
06 / KLIER, John
33 Lead Mine Road
Leverett MA 01054 / US
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date17734544.401.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35422
Priority number, dateUS201662345334P03.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662345334 P
US20161523419111.08.2016         Original published format: US201615234191
US201662384969P08.09.2016         Original published format: US 201662384969 P
US20161529863720.10.2016         Original published format: US201615298637
US20171541000319.01.2017         Original published format: US201715410003
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017210415
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464485
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/24, C08F290/06, C08G65/329, C09D171/02, C08G65/332, C08F299/02, C08G63/52, C08G63/553, C08G63/676, C09D167/02
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGEN MIT POLYESTERMAKROMEREN MIT 1,1-DICARBONYL-SUBSTITUIERTEN 1-ALKENEN[2019/15]
English:COATINGS CONTAINING POLYESTER MACROMERS CONTAINING 1,1-DICARBONYL-SUBSTITUTED 1 ALKENES[2019/15]
French:REVÊTEMENTS CONTENANT DES MACROMÈRES DE POLYESTER CONTENANT DES ALCÈNES 1 À SUBSTITUTION 1,1-DICARBONYLE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase15.11.2018National basic fee paid 
15.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
15.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
15.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XA]US2015104660  (MALOFSKY BERNARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,13-16,19-30 * paragraphs [0151] - [0169]; table 5 * * paragraph [0031] * [A] 5,6,10-12,17,18