Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471709

EP3471709 - SOFT CHEWABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING PSYLLIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / VILLAGRAN, Maria, Dolores Martinez Serna
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
02 / BUND, Rajesh, K.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
03 / HEPP, James
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
04 / SWIGART, Erin, Nicole
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
05 / NAUGHTON, Valerie, Jean
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date17734551.906.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US36039
Priority number, dateUS201662351680P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351680 P
US201662417359P04.11.2016         Original published format: US 201662417359 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218230
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471709
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/68, A61K36/68
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:WEICHE KAUZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PSYLLIUM[2019/17]
English:SOFT CHEWABLE COMPOSITION COMPRISING PSYLLIUM[2019/17]
French:COMPOSITION MOLLE À MÂCHER COMPRENANT DU PSYLLIUM[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2018National basic fee paid 
28.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
28.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2002197357  (PFEIFFER ERIC JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * example 2 * * table 4 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]US2010303997  (FULTON DAVID JOHN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * table 21 *;
 [Y]US6251421  (NIAZI SARFARAZ K [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 2 * * example 5 *;
 [Y]WO2015125120  (IDI INTEGRATORI DIETETICI ITALIANI S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * page 9, line 1 - line 26 * * claims 1-7 *
by applicantUS5340580
 US4548806
 US4459280
    - ZACHERL et al., "In vitro model to correlate viscosity and bile acid-binding capacity of digested water-soluble and insoluble dietary fibres", Food Chemistry, (20110000), vol. 126, pages 423 - 428, XP027571804