Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472735

EP3472735 - SIMPLIFYING A COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN MODEL WHILE RETAINING REFERENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  12.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dassault Systemes Solidworks Corporation
175 Wyman Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SIEGEL, Robert, M.
c/o Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation
175 Wyman Street
Waltham, MA 02451 / US
02 / VAN ZILE III, Donald
45045 Northport Drive 1205
Macomb Township, MI 48044 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bandpay & Greuter
30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires
75002 Paris / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734583.216.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37955
Priority number, dateUS201662351644P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351644 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218943
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472735
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50, G06T19/20
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VEREINFACHUNG EINER MODELLS FÜR COMPUTERGESTÜTZTE DESIGN BEI EINBEHALTUNG VON REFERENZEN[2019/17]
English:SIMPLIFYING A COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN MODEL WHILE RETAINING REFERENCES[2019/17]
French:SIMPLIFICATION D'UN MODÈLE DE CONCEPTION ASSISTÉE PAR ORDINATEUR AVEC CONSERVATION DES RÉFÉRENCES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
17.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006250388  (ANDERSON TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2560112  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [I]  - David A Selliman, "Automated Geometry Simplification using 3D Evolution for Multi-CAD application in a PLM system", (20121004), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://images.connect2communities.com/pdf/ctcorewhtppronautomatedgeometrysimplificationusing3devolutionformulticadtech4_10_20121.pdf, (20170831), XP055402958 [I] 1-20 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 * * the whole document *
 [A]  - Iti International Technegroup, "Simplification of Large MCAD Equipment Models for Plant and Process", (20160611), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160611074247/http://iti-global.com:80/uploadIMG/moxie/INFO%20SHEETS/CADfix.pdf, (20170831), XP055402971 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *