Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472666

EP3472666 - CAMERA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN INTEGRALLY FORMED HOUSING TOP PART AND A LENS CARRIER, AS WELL AS MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CAMERA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Connaught Electronics Ltd.
Dunmore Road
Tuam, County Galway / IE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / O'CONNOR, Rachel
Dunmore Road
Tuam County Galway / IE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian
Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH
CDA-IP
Laiernstraße 12
74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734659.019.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017EP64907
Priority number, dateDE20161011115617.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016111156
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216385
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472666
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03B17/00, G03B17/02, G03B19/00, H04N5/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KAMERA MIT EINEM INTEGRAL GEFORMTEN GEHÄUSEOBERTEIL UND EINEM LINSENTRÄGER FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG SOWIE KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KAMERA FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2019/17]
English:CAMERA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN INTEGRALLY FORMED HOUSING TOP PART AND A LENS CARRIER, AS WELL AS MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A CAMERA FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE[2019/17]
French:CAMÉRA POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE SUPÉRIEURE DE BOÎTIER FORMÉE D'UNE SEULE PIÈCE ET UN SUPPORT D'OBJECTIF, VÉHICULE À MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CAMÉRA POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase10.12.2018National basic fee paid 
10.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
10.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009244361  (GEBAUER DUANE W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-12 * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0002] , [00 8] , [0 37] , [0 39] , [0 55] *;
 [X]US2014354878  (WINTER HARTMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * figures 2-12 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0 68] - [0070] *;
 [X]US2005206780  (IWASAKI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,11,12 * figure 8 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0 43] *;
 [X]US2015168813  (LANG WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 35] - [0038] *;
 [X]US2010097519  (BYRNE STEVEN V [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * figure 1b * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 43] *;
 [X]US2007031137  (BOGDAN DANUT [RO], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0 35] - [0040] *