Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463703

EP3463703 - METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A SITE CONTAMINATED WITH ASBESTOS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Soletanche Freyssinet
280 Avenue Napoleon Bonaparte
92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SARRAF, Riad
8 rue du Val Avril
50460 Querqueville / FR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17734784.602.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017FR51397
Priority number, dateFR2016005505703.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655057
[2019/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017207946
Date:07.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463703
Date:10.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B09B3/00, C03C3/00, E04G23/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DEKONTAMINATION EINES MIT ASBEST KONTAMINIERTEN STANDORTES[2019/15]
English:METHOD FOR DECONTAMINATING A SITE CONTAMINATED WITH ASBESTOS[2019/15]
French:PROCEDE DE DEPOLLUTION D'UN SITE CONTAMINE PAR DE L'AMIANTE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018National basic fee paid 
27.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
27.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2067539  (M TEC KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,4,7-9 * [Y] 3-11;
 [Y]EP2133158  (STREET DESIGN CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2717270  (O T N D ONET TECHNOLOGIES NUCLEAR DECOMMISSIONING [FR]) [A] 1-11 * claim 8 *;
 [A]EP0853959  (INERTEC [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2749523  (CURIE PATRICK [FR]) [Y] 3-11 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0853959
 EP2717270