Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469645

EP3469645 - METHOD FOR THERMALLY TREATING A LITHIUM BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/16]METHOD OF HEAT TREATMENT FOR A LITHIUM BATTERY
[2019/52]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Blue Solutions
Odet
29500 Ergué Gabéric / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LECUYER, Margaud
45 Route de Kerglib
29760 Penmarc'h / FR
02 / BODENEZ, Vincent
28A Avenue des Glénan
29000 Quimper / FR
03 / BERNARDO, Philippe
Appt 216
Bât. B
6 Allée du Verger
29000 Quimper / FR
04 / DRU, Mathieu
5 Résidence Anatole Le Braz
29510 Briec / FR
05 / DESCHAMPS, Marc
9 Allée Georges Macé
29000 Quimper / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17734787.907.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51433
Priority number, dateFR2016005523908.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655239
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212171
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469645
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/38, H01M4/58, H01M10/04, H01M10/052, H01M10/0565
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR THERMISCHEN BEHANDLUNG EINER LITHIUMBATTERIE[2019/52]
English:METHOD FOR THERMALLY TREATING A LITHIUM BATTERY[2019/52]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE D'UNE BATTERIE AU LITHIUM[2019/16]
Former [2019/16]VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG FÜR EINE LITHIUMBATTERIE
Former [2019/16]METHOD OF HEAT TREATMENT FOR A LITHIUM BATTERY
Entry into regional phase26.11.2018National basic fee paid 
26.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
26.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2005000086  (MIZUTANI TORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0056] , [0059] - [0060] * [A] 8-15;
 [YA]US2004229118  (WENSLEY C GLEN [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,15 * paragraph [0020] * [A] 3-5,8-14;
 [YA]US2002164531  (SEKINO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0069] * [A] 8-15;
 [YA]US2015311490  (MURASE TOMOYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6,7,15 * paragraphs [0073] , [0132] * [A] 2-5,8-14;
 [YA]US2015270523  (TOYODA YUJIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7,15 * paragraphs [0199] - [0203] * [A] 8-14;
 [YA]US2004023114  (SADA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0083] * [A] 2-5,8-15;
 [YA]JP2013097993  (HITACHI MAXELL) [Y] 1,6,7 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] - [0116] * [A] 2-5,8-15
by applicantUS2014197799