Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471882

EP3471882 - PIPETTING SYSTEM TIP HAVING DOUBLE CONICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GILSON SAS
19, avenue des Entrepreneurs
ZI Tissonvilliers, BP 145
95400 Villiers-le-Bel / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DUDEK, Bruno
5 Route Manon Montgresin
60560 Orry La Ville / FR
02 / BARBIEUX, Jonathan
4 Cours Buisson
77186 Noisiel / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734800.015.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51552
Priority number, dateFR2016005565217.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655652
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216489
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471882
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3471882
Date:11.12.2019
Language:FR
[2019/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PIPETTIERSYSTEMSPITZE MIT DOPPELTER KONIZITÄT[2019/17]
English:PIPETTING SYSTEM TIP HAVING DOUBLE CONICITY[2019/17]
French:EMBOUT DE SYSTEME DE PIPETAGE PRESENTANT UNE CONICITE DOUBLE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2019Fee for grant paid
04.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]FR3026658  (GILSON SAS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 24 - page 9, line 13 * * figures 2, 3, 3 *
by applicantFR3026658