Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471770

EP3471770 - TUNABLE CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autolus Limited
Forest House
58 Wood Lane
London W12 7RZ / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PULÉ, Martin
c/o Autolus Limited
Forest House
58 Wood Lane
London W12 7RZ / GB
02 / THOMAS, Simon
c/o Autolus Limited
Forest House
58 Wood Lane
London W12 7RZ / GB
03 / CORDOBA, Shaun
c/o Autolus Limited
Forest House
58 Wood Lane
London W12 7RZ / GB
04 / KOKALAKI, Evangelia
c/o Autolus Limited
Forest House
58 Wood Lane
London W12 7RZ / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734809.115.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB51743
Priority number, dateGB2016001051516.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610515
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216562
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471770
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K16/28
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ABSTIMMBARE CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTOREN[2019/17]
English:TUNABLE CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS[2019/17]
French:RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES MODULABLES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2016030691  (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]) [I] 1-38 * page 12, line 20 - page 15, line 13 * * page 22, line 20 - page 23, line 11 * * figures 10, 11; example 3 *;
 [A]WO2015150771  (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-38 * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 2 * * page 34, paragraph top * * page 41 * * figure 5 *;
 [AP]WO2016102965  (UCL BUSINESS PLC [GB]; AUTOLUS LTD [GB]) [AP] 1-38 * figure 3; sequence 14 *
 [A]  - QIN HAIYING ET AL, "Preclinical Development of Bispecific Chimeric Antigen Receptor Targeting Both CD19 and CD22", BLOOD, & 57TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; ORLANDO, FL, USA; DECEMBER 05 -08, 2015, (201512), vol. 126, no. 23, ISSN 0006-4971, XP055274953 [A] 1-38 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2014-11-612903
by applicantUS7052906
    - GRUPP et al., New Eng. J. Med, (20130000), vol. 368, pages 1509 - 1518
    - TURTLE et al., J. Clin Invest., (20160000), URL: http://dx.doi.orq/10.1172/JCI85309
    - PORTER et al., Science Translational Medicine, (20150000), vol. 7, no. 303, page 303ra139
    - LUCKNER et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20070000), vol. 368, pages 780 - 790
    - HASO et al., Blood, (20130000), vol. 121, no. 7
    - WEN et al., J. Immunol. Baltim. Md 1950, (20120000), vol. 188, pages 1075 - 1082
    - HASO et al., Blood, (20130000), vol. 121, no. 7, pages 1165 - 74
    - JAMES et al., Journal of immunology, (20080000), vol. 180, no. 10, pages 7028 - 38
    - KLOTZSCHE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 24591 - 24599
    - ULLMAN et al., Briefings in Functional Genomics, (20110000), vol. 10, pages 125 - 134
    - MIURA et al., Biochim. Et Biophys. Acta, (20040000), vol. 1673, pages 131 - 138
    - VASSILEV et al., Small-Molecule Inhibitors of Protein-Protein Interactions, ISBN 978-3-642-17082-9
    - RIVERA et al., Nature Med, (19960000), vol. 2, pages 1028 - 1032
    - WHITE et al., Expert Rev. Mol. Med., (20080000), vol. 10, page e8
    - LUPAS; GRUBER, Advances in Protein Chemistry, (20070000), vol. 70, pages 37 - 38
    - N. ZACCAI et al., Nature Chem. Bio., (20110000), pages 935 - 941
    - J. LIU et al., PNAS, (20060000), pages 15457 - 15462
    - DONNELLY et al., Journal of General Virology, (20010000), vol. 82, pages 1027 - 1041
    - CAMPANA et al., "Immunophenotyping of leukemia", J. Immunol. Methods, (20000000), vol. 243, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00228-3, pages 59 - 75, XP004210693

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(00)00228-3
    - ROGUSKA et al., Protein Eng., (19960000), vol. 9, pages 895 - 904