Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464074

EP3464074 - A CLOSING STATION FOR CLOSING A CARDBOARD BOX FORMED ABOUT AN ARTICLE AND A MACHINE FOR PACKING AN ARTICLE INTERNALLY OF A CARDBOARD BOX OBTAINED FROM A CARDBOARD BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
07.06.2019Change - extension statespublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F.L. Auto S.r.l.
Via della Croce 87
00187 Roma (RM) / IT
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / PONTI, Giuseppe
Via Copernico 38
06011 Cerbara- Citta' di Castello (PG) / IT
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Dall'Olio, Christian , et al
INVENTION S.r.l. Via delle Armi, 1
40137 Bologna / IT
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17734821.618.05.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017IB52941
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0373924.05.2016         Original published format: IT UA20163739
[2019/15]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017203401
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464074
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65B5/02, B65B7/26, B65B7/20, B65D5/20, B65D5/44, B65B49/08, B65B11/00, B31B50/52, B31B50/62, B31B100/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SCHLIESSSTATION ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES KARTONS IN DESSEN INNEREN SICH EIN ARTIKEL BEFINDET UND WELCHER AUS EINEM UM DIESEN ARTIKEL GEFALTETEN KARTONBOGEN GEBILDET IST[2019/24]
English:A CLOSING STATION FOR CLOSING A CARDBOARD BOX FORMED ABOUT AN ARTICLE AND A MACHINE FOR PACKING AN ARTICLE INTERNALLY OF A CARDBOARD BOX OBTAINED FROM A CARDBOARD BLANK[2019/15]
French:POSTE DE FERMETURE DESTINÉ À FERMER UNE BOÎTE EN CARTON FORMÉE AUTOUR D'UN ARTICLE, ET MACHINE DESTINÉE À EMBALLER UN ARTICLE À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UNE BOÎTE EN CARTON OBTENUE À PARTIR D'UNE DÉCOUPE EN CARTON[2019/15]
Former [2019/15]SCHLIESSSTATION ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINER KARTONSCHACHTEL UM EINEN ARTIKEL UND MASCHINE ZUM VERPACKEN EINES ARTIKELS IN EINER KARTONSCHACHTEL AUS EINEM KARTONZUSCHNITT
Entry into regional phase19.12.2018National basic fee paid 
19.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
19.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015360433  (FEIJEN FRANSISCUS HERMANNUS [NL] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3405503  (MIZELLE ADRIAN C ET AL) [A] 1 * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 10; figures 2,6-8,15,21-24 *;
 [A]WO2014033624  (PONTI GROUP HOLDING S P A [IT]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *