Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471827

EP3471827 - EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES WITH ENHANCED POTENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  13.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Therapeutics Corporation
1040 Spring Street
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HOGAN, Sarah
10117 Goodview Court
Raleigh, North Carolina 27613 / US
02 / ILAGAN, Roger Marquez
2517 Sevier Street
Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US
03 / RODRIGUEZ, Maria Pia
2025 Copper Leaf Parkway
Apt. 302
Durham, North Carolina 27703 / US
04 / MEDRANO, Carolina
1101 Exchange Place
Apt. 531
Durham, North Carolina 27713 / US
05 / CHEADLE, John
908B Iredell Street
Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17734909.916.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37989
Priority number, dateUS201662351627P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351627 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218964
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471827
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61P11/00, A61K35/28
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:EXTRAZELLULÄRE VESIKEL MIT ERHÖHTER WIRKSAMKEIT[2019/17]
English:EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES WITH ENHANCED POTENCY[2019/17]
French:VÉSICULES EXTRACELLULAIRES À ACTIVITÉ AMÉLIORÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2012125471  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-52 *cf. abstract, page 2, line 9 bridging with line 16 at page 3, claims 1 and 15-17*;
 [X]WO2014022373  (UNITED THERAPEUTICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-52 *cf. abstract, paras. [0009] and [0010] at page 3, claims 1, 24 and 37*;
 [X]WO2015179227  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1-52 *cf. abstract, page 3, lines 21-29, page 10, line 14 bridging with line 2 at page 12, claims 1, 24 and 37*;
 [I]WO2015016761  (ISLETONE AB [SE]) [I] 1-52 *cf. abstract, page 4, 4th para and last para. bridging with line 2 at page 5*;
 [Y]WO2012108842  (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG], et al) [Y] 1-52 *cf. page 9, line 19 bridging with line 11 at page 10, page 47, examples 5 and 6, furthermore example 14 at pages 55 and 56 and 2nd para. of page 59*;
 [Y]  - C. LEE ET AL, "Exosomes Mediate the Cytoprotective Action of Mesenchymal Stromal Cells on Hypoxia-Induced Pulmonary Hypertension", CIRCULATION, US, (20121031), vol. 126, no. 22, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.112.114173, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2601 - 2611, XP055401234 [Y] 1-52 *cf. abstract, page 4, the last two paras. reporting on the "Results" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.112.114173
by applicantUS5486359
    - KEILY et al., BMJ, (20130000), vol. 346, page f2028
    - M. HUMBERT et al., J. Am. Coll. Cardiol., (20040000), vol. 43, pages 13S - 24S
    - G. E. D'ALONZO et al., Ann. Intern. Med., (19910000), vol. 115, pages 343 - 349
    - Essential Molecular Biology: A Practical Approach, IRL Press, (19910000), vol. 1, 2
    - DNA Cloning: A Practical Approach, IRL Press, (19950000), vol. 1-4
    - Current Protocols in Immunology, John Wiley & Sons
    - RISSANEN et al., Eur. J. Clin. Invest., (20010000), vol. 31, pages 651 - 666
    - DORMANDY; RUTHERFORD, J. Vase. Surg., (20000000), vol. 31, pages S1 - S296
    - "Second European Consensus Document on Chronic Critical Leg Ischemia", Circulation, (19910000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages IV 1 - 26
    - M. R. TYRRELL et al., Br. J. Surg, (19930000), vol. 80, pages 177 - 180
    - M. ENEROTH et al., Int. Orthop, (19920000), vol. 16, pages 383 - 387
    - Circulation, (19910000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages IV 1 - 26
    - DIMAURO et al., Am. J. Med. Genet., (20010000), vol. 106, pages 18 - 26
    - LEONARD et al., Lancet, (20000000), vol. 355, pages 299 - 304
    - THERY et al., Current Protocols in Cell Biol., (20060000), vol. 3.22
    - BOING et al., Journal of Extracellular Vesicles, (20140000), vol. 3, page 23430
    - Kidney International, (20060000), vol. 69, pages 1471 - 1476