Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468504

EP3468504 - MEDICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SHUTTING OFF A BODY CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.M.I. Agency for Medical Innovations GmbH
Im Letten 1
6800 Feldkirch / AT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / HOHLRIEDER, Martin
Kneippgasse 53a
6840 Götzis / AT
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hofmann, Ralf U. , et al
Hofmann & Fechner
Patentanwälte
Hörnlingerstrasse 3
Postfach 5
6830 Rankweil / AT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17734971.901.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017AT00046
Priority number, dateAT2016000029314.06.2016         Original published format: AT 2932016
[2019/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214644
Date:21.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468504
Date:17.04.2019
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, A61F5/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABSPERREN EINES KÖRPERKANALS[2019/16]
English:MEDICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SHUTTING OFF A BODY CHANNEL[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL POUR BLOQUER UN CANAL CORPOREL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase23.10.2018National basic fee paid 
23.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
23.10.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3863622  (BUUCK ROBERT ENNO) [X] 1,5-10 * columns 5-16; figures 1,15 * * column 6, lines 29-32 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 17 * [Y] 8-10;
 [XY]DE10013519  (ADEVA MEDICAL GES FUER ENTWICK [DE]) [X] 1,5,7 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0016] , [0018] * [Y] 8-10;
 [A]US4784660  (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2373272  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012130157  (COTNER RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0049] - [0050]; figures 5A, 5B, 6A *