Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469286

EP3469286 - HEAT EXCHANGER-ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hutchinson
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOPARD, Fabrice
10, allée du Doulan
38400 Saint Martin d'Heres / FR
02 / CHAUVET, Boris
7, place Saint Mace
45210 Ferrieres / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Pichat, Thierry , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Pichat, Thierry , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17735200.209.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51482
Priority number, dateFR2016005539410.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655394
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212198
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469286
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/00, F28D20/02, F28F3/04, F28F9/00, F28D20/00, F01M5/02, F01P7/00, F28D21/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:WÄRMETAUSCHER-AKKUMULATOR[2019/16]
English:HEAT EXCHANGER-ACCUMULATOR[2019/16]
French:ECHANGEUR STOCKEUR D'ENERGIE THERMIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR3025873  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1-3 * figure 3 * [I] 4;
 [X]FR3025596  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,7,8 *;
 [X]US2010307180  (YAMADA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 4 *;
 [XY]US2010223949  (HIGASHIYAMA NAOHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 * [Y] 6-8;
 [X]WO2010150774  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [X] 4,5 * figures 15,16 *;
 [X]FR3000188  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [X] 4,5 * figures 2,4a,4b *;
 [Y]JP2006226628  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 6-8 * figures 12a-c *
by applicantEP0165179
 WO8900664
 EP2690137
 EP2690141