Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469287

EP3469287 - METHOD FOR HEAT EXCHANGE AND CONDITIONING OF A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hutchinson
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CHOPARD, Fabrice
10, allée du Doulan
38400 Saint Martin d'Heres / FR
02 / CHAUVET, Boris
7, place Saint Mace
45210 Ferrieres / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Pichat, Thierry , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S.
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Pichat, Thierry , et al
Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud SAS
3, rue Auber
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date17735203.609.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017FR51485
Priority number, dateFR2016005539310.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655393
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212201
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469287
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F28D9/00, F28D20/02, F28D20/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM WÄRMEAUSTAUSCH UND KONDITIONIERUNG EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR HEAT EXCHANGE AND CONDITIONING OF A HEAT EXCHANGER[2019/16]
French:PROCEDE D'ECHANGE ET DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'UN ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]FR3025873  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [I] 1-15 * page 5 - page 6 *;
 [I]FR3025596  (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2010223949  (HIGASHIYAMA NAOHISA [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2006226628  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0165179
 WO8900664
 EP2690137
 EP2690141