Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472678

EP3472678 - MEANS FOR CONTROLLING INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL PROCESSES DEPLOYED ON AN INDUSTRIAL SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FPC Ingenierie
8 place Camille Georges
Le White
69002 Lyon / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PLANCHON, Frédéric
7 rue de la Piscine
69230 Saint-Genis Laval / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Verriest, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
12, rue Boileau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17735207.712.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51492
Priority number, dateFR2016005553515.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655535
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216460
Date:21.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472678
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/418, G06F3/048
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:MITTEL ZUR STEUERUNG DER AN EINEM INDUSTRIESTANDORT ANGEWENDETEN INSTRUMENTATION UND STEUERUNGSPROZESSE[2019/17]
English:MEANS FOR CONTROLLING INSTRUMENTATION AND CONTROL PROCESSES DEPLOYED ON AN INDUSTRIAL SITE[2019/17]
French:MOYENS DE PILOTAGE DE PROCESSUS DE CONTRÔLE-COMMANDE DÉPLOYÉS DANS UN SITE INDUSTRIEL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]FR3010202  (FREDERIC PLANCHON CONSEIL [FR]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * pages 1-6 * * pages 8-11 * * pages 14,15 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2009216341  (ENKERUD TORGEIR [NO] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0007] , [0034] , [0053] * * paragraphs [0101] - [0105] * * figures 1,3,5-7 *