Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471683

EP3471683 - SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING A VARIABLE PRESSURE FOR AN ENCLOSURE FOR TREATMENT OF A WOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DTAMedical
5 Impasse du Finistère
39300 Loulle / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DUFAY, François
5 impasse du Finistère
39300 Loulle / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
51 avenue Jean Jaurès
BP 7073
69301 Lyon Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17735217.615.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51560
Priority number, dateFR2016005572020.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655720
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220889
Date:28.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471683
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61H33/14
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON VARIABLEM DRUCK FÜR EIN GEHÄUSE ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER WUNDE[2019/17]
English:SYSTEM FOR DELIVERING A VARIABLE PRESSURE FOR AN ENCLOSURE FOR TREATMENT OF A WOUND[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME APTE À DÉLIVRER UNE PRESSION VARIABLE POUR UNE ENCEINTE DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE PLAIE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2012065576  (STRYKER MARTIN W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,17 * paragraphs [0052] - [0100]; figure - *;
 [X]US2012232467  (NAKAMURA SHOICHI [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0013] - [0071]; figure - *;
 [X]EP2279721  (NAKAMURA SHOICHI [JP]; ACP JAPAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,17 * paragraphs [0031] - [0070]; figure - *;
 [X]JP2005058745  (NEXTIER KK) [X] 1-8,17 * paragraphs [0032] - [0085]; figure - *;
 [X]US2005191372  (STENZLER ALEX [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,17 * paragraphs [0058] - [0092]; figure - *