Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463793

EP3463793 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING PRESSURIZED HOUSINGS FOR FORMING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / THATTAI PARTHASARATHY, Krishnan Balaji
1 Research Circle
KWC-276
Niskayuna, NY 12309-1027 / US
02 / BOLLACKER, James Duvall
1 Research Circle
Niskayuna, NY 12309-1027 / US
03 / HOCKEMEYER, Matthew, Harper
1 Research Circle
Niskayuna, NY 12309-1027 / US
04 / JOHANNS, Wade Walter
Wade Walter Johanns
1 Research Circle
KW-C276
Niskayuna, NY 12309-1027 / US
05 / SINHA, Shatil
1 Research Circle
Bldg. K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Williams, Andrew Richard
GE International Inc.
GPO-Europe The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17735253.114.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US27516
Priority number, dateUS20161516309624.05.2016         Original published format: US201615163096
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204920
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463793
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C43/12, B29C43/10, B29C43/36, B29C70/34, B29C51/28, B29L31/08, B29L31/30, B29C70/44, B29C70/32
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME MIT UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN GEHÄUSEN ZUR FORMUNG VON MATERIALIEN[2019/15]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS INCLUDING PRESSURIZED HOUSINGS FOR FORMING MATERIALS[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES COMPRENANT DES BOÎTIERS MIS SOUS PRESSION POUR FORMER DES MATÉRIAUX[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US5173314  (HOSOI MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,13,15-18,20,21 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 59; figures 1,1a,1b,3,7,8,9,10 * [A] 11 [I] 5,10,14,19;
 [XAI]US4034054  (SAUER DONALD G) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,13,15-18,20,21 * column 1, lines 6-23,44-52 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 23 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-4 * [A] 11 [I] 5,10,14,19;
 [XP]EP3067182  (PIEKENBRINK COMPOSITE GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-10,12,13,15-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0035] - [0044]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPS63144037  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2561978  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - CLERICO M ET AL, "TECHNOLOGIE DI FORMATURA DI COMPOSITI A MATRICE TERMOPLASTICA", INTERPLASTICS, 41981 3, (19930501), vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0392-3800, pages 76 - 81, XP000382381 [X] 1,2,6-8,16-18,21 * page 80; figure 12 *