blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3463793 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780031913 EP17735253



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019516591Global Dossier 20.06.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017US27516 14.04.2017
US201615163096 24.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109476054Global Dossier 15.03.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2017US27516 14.04.2017
US201615163096 24.05.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3463793Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2017US27516 14.04.2017
US201615163096 24.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017204920Global Dossier 30.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615163096 24.05.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2017341310Global Dossier 30.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615163096 24.05.2016