Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469682

EP3469682 - MEDICAL DEVICE PACKAGING WITH POWER SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Scimed Inc.
One Scimed Place
Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WEBER, Jan
Holdaal 49
6228 GJ Maastricht / NL
02 / BURGESS, Daniel
1750 242nd Ave NW
St. Francis Minnesota 55070 / US
03 / JOHNSON, Kathryn A.
8917 Norwood Lane N
Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US
04 / PECK, James M.
217 West Eagle Lake Dr.
Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17735267.109.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US36840
Priority number, dateUS201662347896P09.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662347896 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214560
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469682
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, A61L2/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT STROMQUELLE[2019/16]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE PACKAGING WITH POWER SOURCE[2019/16]
French:BOÎTIER DE DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL AVEC BLOC D'ALIMENTATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2007048176  (ORRICO MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0036] - [0038] - [0 42]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 9-12,15 [I] 4,8,13,14;
 [X]JP2000287987  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [X] 1,5 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2008154178  (CARTER DARRICK [US] ET AL) [Y] 9-12,15 * paragraphs [0224] - [0226]; figures 31-33 *;
 [I]US4641076  (LINDEN HARRY A [US]) [I] 1,8,14 * columns 2,3; figure 2 *
by applicantUS9076589
 US9276292