Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472210

EP3472210 - SITE-SPECIFIC CROSSLINKING OF ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AGNEW, Brian
c/o Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
02 / AGGELER, Robert
c/o Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
03 / BRAWER, Rolando
c/o Life Technologies Corporation
5823 Newton Drive
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Thermo Fisher Scientific- Life Sciences Solutions Group
Life Technologies
Frankfurter Straße 129b
64293 Darmstadt / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17735277.016.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37871
Priority number, dateUS201662351350P17.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662351350 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218891
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472210
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/46, C12P21/00, C12P21/06, A61K47/54
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:STELLENSPEZIFISCHE VERNETZUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN[2019/17]
English:SITE-SPECIFIC CROSSLINKING OF ANTIBODIES[2019/17]
French:RÉTICULATION SPÉCIFIQUE À UN SITE D'ANTICORPS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
16.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007190597  (AGNEW BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0181] * * paragraph [0195] - paragraph [0197] * * paragraph [0231] *;
 [Y]WO2014066733  (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138 * page 4, line 1 - page 25, line 15 * * claims 1-27 *;
 [XY]WO2015175357  (SORRENTO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 57,60-62,123-133 * abstract * * example 5 * * figure 10 * * claims 1-27 * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138;
 [XY]WO2014153002  (CALIFORNIA INST BIOMEDICAL RES [US], et al) [X] 57,60-62,123-133 * examples 2-4 * [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138
 [Y]  - BRIAN M. ZEGLIS ET AL, "Enzyme-Mediated Methodology for the Site-Specific Radiolabeling of Antibodies Based on Catalyst-Free Click Chemistry", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20130619), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1021/bc400122c, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 1057 - 1067, XP055101895 [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc400122c
 [Y]  - PRADMAN K. QASBA, "Glycans of Antibodies as a Specific Site for Drug Conjugation Using Glycosyltransferases", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (20151118), vol. 26, no. 11, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.5b00173, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2170 - 2175, XP055398267 [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138 * abstract * * page 2172, column r, paragraph 1 - page 2174, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.5b00173
 [Y]  - HU QI-YING ET AL, "Towards the next generation of biomedicines by site-selective conjugation", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (20160321), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 1691 - 1719, XP002772944 [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138 * page 1705, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * * page 1707, column r, paragraph 4 - page 1708, column l, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C4CS00388H
 [A]  - HAIMING LUO ET AL, "Noninvasive brain cancer imaging with a bispecific antibody fragment, generated via click chemistry", PROCEEDINGS NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES PNAS, US, (20150928), vol. 112, no. 41, doi:10.1073/pnas.1509667112, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12806 - 12811, XP055297009 [A] 1,3,5-45,49-62,123-138 * page 12807, column l, paragraph 3 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1509667112
 [XY]  - KOEN WAGNER ET AL, "Bispecific antibody generated with sortase and click chemistry has broad antiinfluenza virus activity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20141110), vol. 111, no. 47, doi:10.1073/pnas.1408605111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 16820 - 16825, XP055205415 [X] 57,60-62,123-133 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 1,3,5-45,49-56,58,59,134-138

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1408605111
by applicantWO2009067663
 US2005222427
 US2010197871
 US2006276658
 US5821337
 US7527791
 US6982321
 US7087409
 US5766886
 EP0184187
 EP0171496
 EP0173494
 WO8601533
 US4816567
 EP0125023
 US5225539
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5569825
 US5661016
 US5545806
 US2005130235
 US7416541
    - VOGEL' S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PRACTICAL ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 5TH ED., Longman Scientific and Technical Ltd., (19910000), pages 809 - 816
    - HELLER, Acc. Chem. Res, (19900000), vol. 23, page 128
    - AGARD et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, no. 46, pages 15046 - 15047
    - DEBETS et al., Chem. Comm, (20100000), vol. 46, pages 97 - 99
    - DOMMERHOLT et al., Angew. Chem., (20100000), vol. 122, pages 9612 - 9615
    - AGARD et al., L Am. Chem. Soc, (20040000), vol. 126, no. 46, pages 15046 - 15047
    - DEBETS et al., Chem. Comm., (20100000), vol. 46, pages 97 - 99
    - E. SAXON; C. BERTOZZI, Science, (20000000), vol. 287, pages 2007 - 2010
    - LEWIS W G et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed, vol. 41, no. 6, page 1053
    - KOLB, H.C. et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed, (20010000), vol. 40, pages 2004 - 2021
    - JENTZSCH et al., Inorganic Chemistry, (20090000), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 9593 - 9595
    - STAUDINGER et al., Helv. Chim. Acta, (19190000), vol. 2, page 635
    - GOLOLOBOV et al., Tetrahedron, (19800000), vol. 37, page 437
    - GOLOLOBOV et al., Tetrahedron, (19920000), vol. 48, page 1353
    - ALMAGRO; FRANSSON, Front. Biosci, (20080000), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 1633
    - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329
    - QUEEN et al., Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033
    - KASHMIRI et al., Methods, (20050000), vol. 36, pages 25 - 34
    - PADLAN, Mol. Immunol, (19910000), vol. 28, pages 489 - 498
    - DALL'ACQUA et al., Methods, (20050000), vol. 36, pages 43 - 60
    - OSBOURN et al., Methods, (20050000), vol. 36, pages 61 - 68
    - KLIMKA et al., Br. J. Cancer, (20000000), vol. 83, pages 252 - 260
    - BETTER et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043
    - LIU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443
    - LIU et al., J. Immunol, (19870000), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526
    - SUN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218
    - NISHIMURA et al., Cane. Res, (19870000), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005
    - WOOD et al., Nature, (19850000), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449
    - SHAW et al., J. Natl. Cancer Inst, (19880000), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559
    - MORRISON, S. L., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207
    - OI et al., BioTechniques, (19860000), vol. 4, page 214
    - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525
    - VERHOEYAN et al., Science, vol. 239, page 1534
    - BEIDLER et al., J. Immunol., (19880000), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060
    - LONBERG; HUSZAR, Int. Rev. Immunol, (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - JESPERS et al., Biotechnology, (19940000), vol. 12, pages 899 - 903
    - KHIDEKEL et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20030000), vol. 125, pages 16162 - 16163
    - SAXON, E. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), vol. 124, no. 50, pages 14893 - 14902
    - PETERS et al., Pharm Res, (20120000), vol. 29, pages 1618 - 1626
    - DADDONA et al., Pharm Res, (20110000), vol. 28, pages 159 - 165
 WO2003US17311
 WO1986US02269