Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472573

EP3472573 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING AND OPTIMIZING FLARE PURGE GAS WITH A WIRELESS ROTAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
1 Eastern Avenue
Dhahran 31311 / SA
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / DANIEL, Selvam
Saudi Arabian Oil Company
P.O.Box 252
Saudi Aramco
Dhahran 31311 / SA
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Williams, Michael David
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17735279.616.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017US37906
Priority number, dateUS20161518521217.06.2016         Original published format: US201615185212
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218913
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472573
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/22, G01F1/24, G01F15/00, G01F15/04, G01F15/06, F23G7/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND OPTIMIERUNG VON FACKELSPÜLGAS MIT EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ROTAMETER[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING AND OPTIMIZING FLARE PURGE GAS WITH A WIRELESS ROTAMETER[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE ET D'OPTIMISATION DE GAZ DE PURGE DE TORCHE À L'AIDE D'UN ROTAMÈTRE SANS FIL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]US4634369  (MCGILL JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 12 * claims 12,13 * * figure 3 * * column 3, line 34 - line 57 * [I] 1-11,13-20;
 [A]US2016091355  (MESNARD DAVID RUSSELL [US], et al) [A] 6,18 * paragraph [0041] *
 [A]  - HEMALATHA J ET AL, "Design and development of wireless flow transmitter", 2016 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL, ELECTRONICS, AND OPTIMIZATION TECHNIQUES (ICEEOT), IEEE, (20160303), doi:10.1109/ICEEOT.2016.7755273, pages 3106 - 3110, XP033000961 [A] 1-11,13-20 * IV Conclusion; page 3110 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICEEOT.2016.7755273