Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468585

EP3468585 - CALR AND JAK2 VACCINE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IO Biotech APS
Ole Maaløes Vej 3
2200 Copenhagen N / DK
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSEN, Mads Hald
Hegnsvej 61
2850 Nærum / DK
02 / HOLMSTRÖM, Morten Orebo
Odensevej 60
4000 Roskilde / DK
03 / HASSELBALCH, Hans
Maj Allé 90
2860 Søborg / DK
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17735379.409.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017DK50190
Priority number, dateDK2016007041710.06.2016         Original published format: DK 201670417
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2017211371
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3468585
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/00, A61P35/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:CALR- UND JAK2-IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2019/16]
English:CALR AND JAK2 VACCINE COMPOSITIONS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS VACCINALES À BASE DE CALR ET DE JAK2[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]EP2808338  (CEMM FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-7,20,21,28-30,34,35,41,45,53-57,68,69,72,73,80,81,84,87-92,103-106 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] - [0010] * * page 14, lines 8-39 * * page 15, lines 31-33,45-53 * * paragraphs [0314] , [0317] - [0331] - [0334] - [0346] * * sequences 4,112,32,132,144,128,8,12,136,140,44, * * sequences 124,16,76,24,40,100,120,84,72,116,28,96,36,80,48 * [I] 8-11,16,22-26,36,38-40,42-44,46-52,58-67,70,71,74-79,82,83,85-88,97-99;
 [X]WO2016087514  (CEMM FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM FÜR MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN GMBH [AT]) [X] 68,69 * abstract * * example 1 * * page 2, paragraph l * * pages 6-7; sequences 35-70 *;
 [XI]WO2007047653  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,12-24,27,28,31-33,37-42,45-50,52-54,72,73,76,80,81,84,93-96,100-102,107-110 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 13, paragraph l - page 14, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 18, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * examples 2,4,5,6; claims 1-52 * [I] 25,43,44,51,55-67,70,71,74,75,77-79,82,83,85-88;
 [X]WO2006045827  (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR], et al) [X] 68,69 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, lines 21-26 * * page 19, line 13 - page 21, line 7 *
 [X]  - VANNUCCHI A M ET AL, "Calreticulin mutation-specific immunostaining in myeloproliferative neoplasms: pathogenetic insight and diagnostic value.", LEUKEMIA SEP 2014, (201409), vol. 28, no. 9, ISSN 1476-5551, pages 1811 - 1818, XP002766532 [X] 68,69 * abstract * * page 1813, column 2, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/leu.2014.100
 [A]  - THORSTEN KLAMPFL ET AL, "Somatic Mutations of Calreticulin in Myeloproliferative Neoplasms", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, THE - NEJM -, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, (20131219), vol. 369, no. 25, doi:10.1056/NEJMOA1311347, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 2379 - 2390, XP002733585 [A] 1-11,16,20-26,28-30,34-36,38-92,97-99,103-106 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1311347
 [A]  - J. NANGALIA ET AL, "Somatic CALR Mutations in Myeloproliferative Neoplasms with Nonmutated JAK2", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20131210), vol. 369, no. 25, doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1312542, ISSN 0028-4793, pages 2391 - 2405, XP055148137 [A] 1-11,16,20-26,28-30,34-36,38-92,97-99,103-106 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1312542
 [X]  - Rena May, "Generation of Specific Human CD8+ T Cell Responses to the Myeloproliferative Disorder Associated V617F Mutated JAK2 Kinase by Use of Analog Peptide Vaccine Candidates. | Blood Journal", (20050101), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/106/11/3512, (20171123), XP055428025 [X] 73,76,80,81,93-96,100-102,107-110 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2009143843
 WO2013056716
 WO9728816
 US58767
 US5554372
    - TEFFERI et al., "Revised response criteria for myelofibrosis: International Working Group-Myeloproliferative Neoplasms Research and Treatment (IWG-MRT) and European LeukemiaNet (ELN) consensus report", Blood, (20130000), vol. 122, no. 8, pages 1395 - 1398
    - Goding, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles & Practice, (19860000), pages 61 - 63
    - ANDERSEN MH; REKER S; KVISTBORG P; BECKER JC; STRATEN P, "Spontaneous immunity against Bcl-xL in cancer patients", J Immunol, (20050000), vol. 175, pages 2709 - 14, XP002533354
    - CABAGNOLS X; DEFOUR JP; UGO V; LANOTTO JC; MOSSUZ P; MONDET J et al., "Differential association of calreticulin type 1 and type 2 mutations with myelofibrosis and essential thrombocytemia: relevance for disease evolution", Leukemia, (20150000), vol. 29, pages 249 - 252
    - COX, J.C.; COULTER, A.R., "Adjuvants--a classification and review of their modes of action", Vaccine, (19970000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00183-1, pages 248 - 56, XP004094403

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00183-1
    - DUNN GP; BRUCE AT; IKEDA H; OLD LJ; SCHREIBER RD, "Cancer immunoediting : from immunosurveillance to tumor escape", Nat Immunol, (20020000), vol. 3, pages 991 - 998
    - HASSELBALCH HC., "Myelofibrosis with myeloid metaplasia: the advanced phase of an untreated disseminated hematological cancer. Time to change our therapeutic attitude with early upfront treatment", Leuk Res, (20090000), vol. 33, pages 11 - 18
    - JEROMIN S; KOHLMANN A; MEGGENDORFER M; SCHINDELA S; PERGLEROVA K; NADARAJAH N et al., "Next-generation deep-sequencing detects multiple clones of CALR mutations in patients with BCR-ABL1 negative MPN", Leukemia, (20160000), vol. 30, pages 973 - 976
    - KLAMPFL T; GISSLINGER H; HARUTYUNYAN AS; NIVARTHI H; RUMI E; MILOSEVIC JD et al., "Somatic mutations of calreticulin in myeloproliferative neoplasms", N Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 369, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1311347, pages 2379 - 2390, XP002733585

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1311347
    - MET O; BALSLEV E; FLYGER H; SVANE IM, "High immunogenic potential of p53 mRNA-transfected dendritic cells in patients with primary breast cancer", Breast Cancer Res Treat, (20110000), vol. 125, doi:doi:10.1007/s10549-010-0844-9, pages 395 - 406, XP019868275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10549-010-0844-9
    - MOODIE Z; PRICE L; GOUTTEFANGEAS C; MANDER A.; JANETZKI S; LOWER M et al., "Response definition criteria for ELISPOT assays revisited", Cancer Immunol Immunother, (20100000), vol. 59, pages 1489 - 1501, XP019842218
    - MUNIR S; ANDERSEN GH; MET O; DONIA M; FROSIG TM; LARSEN SK et al., "HLA-restricted CTL that are specific for the immune checkpoint ligand PD-L1 occur with high frequency in cancer patients", Cancer Res, (20130000), vol. 73, pages 1764 - 1776
    - MUNIR S; ANDERSEN GH; SVANE IM; ANDERSEN MH, "The immune checkpoint regulator PD-L1 is a specific target for naturally occurring CD4(+) T cells", Oncoimmunology, (20130000), vol. 2, page e23991
    - NANGALIA J; MASSIE CE; BAXTER EJ; NICE FL; GUNDEM G; WEDGE DC et al., "Somatic CALR mutations in myeloproliferative neoplasms with nonmutated JAK2", N Engl J Med, (20130000), vol. 369, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1312542, pages 2391 - 2405, XP055148137

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1312542
    - SCHUMACHER TN; SCHREIBER RD, "Neoantigens in cancer immunotherapy", Science, (20150000), vol. 348, no. 158, doi:doi:10.1126/science.aaa4971, pages 69 - 74, XP055185153

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aaa4971
    - TEFFERI A; LASHO TL; FINKE C; BELACHEW A; WASSIE E; KETTERLING RP et al., "Type 1 vs type 2 calreticulin mutations in primary myelofibrosis: differences in phenotype and prognostic impact", Leukemia, (20140000), vol. 28, pages 1568 - 1570
    - TEFFERI A; WASSIE EA; GUGLIELMELLI P; GANGAT N; BELACHEW AA; LASHO TL et al., "Type 1 vs Type 2 calreticulin mutations in essential thrombocythemia: a collaborative study of 1027 patients", Am J Hematol, vol. 2014, no. 89, pages E121 - E124