Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3484436

EP3484436 - A FOAMING CLEANSING COMPOSITION FOR TOPICAL APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.04.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Change - French titlepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
A Company Registered In England And Wales
Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB
[2019/21]
Inventor(s)01 / ATHAVLE, Varsha Amit
Hindustan Unilever Limited BD
Sawant Marg
Chakala
Andheri East
Mumbai 400 099 / IN
02 / KINI, Mridula
Hindustan Unilever Ltd B.D.
Sawant Marg Chakala
Andheri East
Mumbai 400 099 / IN
03 / ROY, Saumyashree
Hindustan Unilever Limited BD
Sawant Marg
Chakala
Andheri East
Mumbai 400 099 / IN
 [2019/21]
Representative(s)Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/21]Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date17735574.010.07.2017
[2019/21]
WO2017EP67236
Priority number, dateEP2016017939314.07.2016         Original published format: EP 16179393
[2019/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018011127
Date:18.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3484436
Date:22.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018
[2019/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/25, A61K8/34, A61K8/44, A61K8/46, A61K8/73, A61Q19/10
[2019/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/21]
TitleGerman:SCHÄUMENDE REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR TOPISCHEN ANWENDUNG[2019/21]
English:A FOAMING CLEANSING COMPOSITION FOR TOPICAL APPLICATION[2019/21]
French:COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE MOUSSANT POUR APPLICATION TOPIQUE[2020/08]
Former [2019/21]COMPOSITION NETTOYANTE MOUSSANTE POUR APPLICATION LOCALE..
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/21]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2010027721  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,14 * pages 4,5; figure 1; examples 1,3,5; claim 2; tables 1,2 * * page 21, lines 15-21 * * page 5, lines 22-29 * [Y] 1-14 [I] 12;
 [Y]GB2455404  (PZ CUSSONS [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 1, lines 4,21-24 * * page 2, lines 5-6 * * page 3, lines 15-19; claims 1-18 * * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 10 *;
 [Y]US2002010109  (CHAMBERS JOHN GEORGE [GB], et al) [Y] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0001]; example 4 *
 [Y]  - DENNIS LABA, "How do I thicken my cosmetic formula", COSMETICS ANS TOILETRIES, (20011130), vol. 116, no. 11, pages 35 - 44, XP055301132 [Y] 1,12 * the whole document * * table 1 *