Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469029

EP3469029 - ACTIVE-ENERGY-RAY-CURABLE LIQUID COMPOSITION, THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT FORMING MATERIAL SET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT PRODUCING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NAITO, Hiroyuki
c/o Ricoh Company Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
02 / IWATA, Hiroshi
c/o Ricoh Company Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
03 / NORIKANE, Yoshihiro
c/o Ricoh Company Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
04 / SHIMADA, Yoshihito
c/o Ricoh Company Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
05 / SUGIURA, Kenji
c/o Ricoh Company Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Lamb, Martin John Carstairs
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Lamb, Martin John Carstairs
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date17735647.405.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017JP20866
Priority number, dateJP2016011745113.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016117451
JP2016011745513.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016117455
JP2016021093427.10.2016         Original published format: JP 2016210934
JP2016024163813.12.2016         Original published format: JP 2016241638
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017217273
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469029
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/101, C09D11/30
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DURCH AKTIVENERGIESTRAHLUNG HÄRTBARE FLÜSSIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, MATERIALSET ZUR FORMUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTS[2019/16]
English:ACTIVE-ENERGY-RAY-CURABLE LIQUID COMPOSITION, THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT FORMING MATERIAL SET, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT, AND THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT PRODUCING APPARATUS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITION LIQUIDE DURCISSABLE PAR RAYONNEMENT D'ÉNERGIE ACTIVE, ENSEMBLE DE MATÉRIAU DE FORMATION D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]AT412399B  (STAMPFL JUERGEN DIPL ING DR [AT]) [X] 1,4-7,11,13,15-19 * claims;; example 5 * * page 2, line 52 - line 54 * [I] 2,3,8-10,12,14;
 [XI]US2013234370  (SUZUKI HIDEYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-8,11-18 * claims 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 11-15 * * paragraphs [0071] - [0085] - [0115] - [0117] - [0126] - [0128] * * table 2 * [I] 9,10;
 [X]WO2015144761  (SQUARED GMBH I [CH]) [X] 1-19 * page 7, line 15 - line 30 * * claims * * page 11, line 18 - line 27 * * page 15, line 21 - line 30 * * tables 1,2 *;
 [E]WO2017122211  (STRATASYS LTD [IL]) [E] 1-11,13-19 * claims * * table 5 * * page 4, line 8 - line 10 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [XP]WO2017029657  (STRATASYS LTD [IL]) [XP] 1-11,13-19 * page 29, line 5 - page 30, line 5 * * page 58, line 20 - line 32 * * page 59 - page 61 *;
 [XPI]WO2016098636  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,3-7,11-19 * table 2 * * claims 10, 11 * * examples * [I] 2,8-10
by applicantJP2003535712
 JP2012111226