Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463008

EP3463008 - AUTOMATIC BEVERAGE MACHINE WITH POURING CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
26.07.2019Change - extension statespublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unal, Altug
Nosab Nilufer Bulvari No:3
16140 Bursa / TR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Yamankaradeniz, Kemal
Destek Patent, Inc.
Eclipse Business D
Blok No. 5 Maslak
34398 Istanbul / TR
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17735664.926.04.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017TR50163
Priority number, dateTR2016000689224.05.2016         Original published format: TR 201606892
[2019/15]
Filing languageTR
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017204761
Date:30.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463008
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/44, A47J31/52, A47J31/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:GETRÄNKEAUTOMAT MIT GIESSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:AUTOMATIC BEVERAGE MACHINE WITH POURING CONTROL SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE BOISSONS DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE DU VERSEMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]GR1003987  (STROUTSIS ALEXANDROU CHARALABO) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP2218378  (NESTEC SA [CH]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]DE202009008447U  (DEMIR NURAN [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *;
 [A]US2001052293  (LANG CHRISTOPH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
by applicantTR200502060
 US2010218687
 TR20120003218