Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471839

EP3471839 - TOGGLE AND ASSEMBLY OF TOGGLE AND SUPPORT MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kee Safety Limited
Cradley Business Park
Overend Road
Cradley Heath, West Midlands B64 7DW / GB
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLMOTT, Graham
Mott House
Southfields Road
Woldingham Surrey CR3 7BQ / GB
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Badger, John Raymond
J.R. Badger & Co.
6 Simpson Road
Wylde Green
Sutton Coldfield
West Midlands B72 1EP / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17736698.614.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017GB00091
Priority number, dateGB2016001057017.06.2016         Original published format: GB 201610570
GB2016001316129.07.2016         Original published format: GB 201613161
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216509
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471839
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:A62B35/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:KIPPSCHALTER UND ANORDNUNG AUS UMSCHALT- UND STÜTZELEMENT[2019/17]
English:TOGGLE AND ASSEMBLY OF TOGGLE AND SUPPORT MEMBER[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE FIXATION ET ENSEMBLE CONSTITUÉ DU SYSTÈME DE FIXATION ET D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5197567  (RABALAIS KEITH J [US]) [Y] 1-17 * column 2, line 35 - column 5, line 41; figure - *;
 [Y]GB1152070  (GKN SCREWS FASTENERS LTD) [Y] 1-17 * page 2, column 1, line 37 - line 50; figure - *;
 [A]EP2687267  (CAPITAL ACCESS SARL [LU]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023]; figure - *;
 [A]DE202006016678U  (ABS SAFETY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011]; figure - *