Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472079

EP3472079 - PALLETIZING AND/OR DEPALLETIZING SYSTEM OF GOODS WITH DRONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Simac Tech S.r.l.
Via dell'Industria 24/26
41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / RUINI, Fabio
c/o Simac Tech S.r.l.
Via dell'Industria 24/26
41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Luppi, Emanuele
Brunacci & Partners S.r.l.
Via Scaglia Est, 19-31
41126 Modena / IT
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17736765.316.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB53590
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0447817.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164478
[2019/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216766
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472079
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B65G61/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:PALETTIER- UND/ODER DEPALETTIERSYSTEM VON WAREN MIT DROHNEN[2019/17]
English:PALLETIZING AND/OR DEPALLETIZING SYSTEM OF GOODS WITH DRONES[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE PALETTISATION ET/OU DE DÉPALETTISATION DE MARCHANDISES AVEC DES DRONES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]EP2886493  (TELEJET KOMMUNIKATIONS GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] *;
 [I]WO2016030797  (GUIDI ANNA [IT]) [I] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2016068264  (GANESH SHRIRAM [US] ET AL) [A] 7-10 * the whole document *
 [XI]  - Jaco Hooijer, "Qimarox examines the use of drones for palletising | Qimarox", (20140127), URL: http://www.qimarox.com/news/qimarox-examines-the-use-of-drones-for-palletising-3671.html, (20170407), XP055363052 [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document * [I] 11
 [XI]  - Kevin Capodice, "Adapting Drones for Modern Material Handling | The Material Handling Blog", (20151204), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://www.bastiansolutions.com/blog/index.php/2015/12/04/adapting-drones-for-material-handling/#.WOeW5HpMfSg, (20170407), XP055363057 [X] 1,3,5 * page 1 - page 4 * [I] 11