Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3481235

EP3481235 - ADDITIVE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / KARLES, Georgios
601 East Jackson Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
02 / OGBONLOWO, Tracy M.
601 East Jackson Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
03 / CRAWFORD, Danielle
601 East Jackson Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
04 / LI, San
601 East Jackson Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)Dowling, Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date17736957.607.07.2017
[2019/20]
WO2017EP67160
Priority number, dateUS20161520436107.07.2016         Original published format: US201615204361
[2019/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018007625
Date:11.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3481235
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24B15/16, A24F47/00
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
TitleGerman:ZUSATZANORDNUNG FÜR E-VAPING-VORRICHTUNG[2019/20]
English:ADDITIVE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE[2019/20]
French:ENSEMBLE ADDITIF DESTINÉ À UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE DE VAPOTAGE[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2018National basic fee paid 
16.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/20]
16.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2015009863  (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] *;
 [A]WO2015013135  (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [A]WO2014116974  (LOEC INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2014261486  (POTTER DENNIS LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0099] *
by applicantUS2013192623
 US2013192619