Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463136

EP3463136 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR GENERATING SMOOTHED IMAGES OF AN ELONGATE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical, Cardiology Division, Inc.
177 East County Road B
St. Paul, MN 55117 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / HILL, Anthony D.
3601 16th Ave. S.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55407 / US
02 / MALININ, Yuriy
5033 Richmond Dr.
Edina, Minnesota 55436 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17737157.227.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US39426
Priority number, dateUS201662362780P15.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662362780 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018013341
Date:18.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463136
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B34/20, A61B90/00, A61B34/10
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ERZEUGUNG GEGLÄTTETER BILDER EINER LÄNGLICHEN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2019/15]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR GENERATING SMOOTHED IMAGES OF AN ELONGATE MEDICAL DEVICE[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGES LISSÉES D'UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ALLONGÉ[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
07.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201903   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012302869  (KOYRAKH LEV A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,17,19,20 * paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2,3c * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0000] * [I] 7,10,15,16;
 [XI]US2012172713  (CARBONERA CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-14,17-19 * paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0000] * * paragraph [0037] * [I] 7,10,15,16;
 [A]WO2006121740  (STRYKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,11,17 * paragraphs [0067] , [0184] , [0114] *;
 [A]WO2010076676  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,11,17 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0007] *;
 [A]US2008221643  (OLSON ERIC S [US]) [A] 7,15 * paragraph [0033] *
by applicantUS7263397
 US6498944
 US6788967
 US6690963
 US6233476
 US7197354
 US7386339