Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472551

EP3472551 - DEVICE FOR RETAINING THE LANYARD OF A HANDGUN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Garibaldi, Jérome
9 rue Grimaldi
98000 Monaco / MC
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Bonneau, Florence
LOGIPI
174 chemin des Gipières
06370 Mouans Sartoux / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17737309.913.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR00117
Priority number, dateFR2016000098020.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1600980
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220870
Date:28.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472551
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F41C23/02, F41C33/00, F41C33/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN DES TRAGEBANDES EINER HANDFEUERWAFFE[2019/17]
English:DEVICE FOR RETAINING THE LANYARD OF A HANDGUN[2019/17]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE DE DRAGONNE D'UNE ARME DE POING[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
18.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XAY]US2013181019  (SALENTINE JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0029] , [0031] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038]; figures 4,5 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 7;
 [YA]US2003213823  (PAPOVITCH WAYNE J [US]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0028] , [0030]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-6;
 [YA]US6427374  (VAIANI JOANN [US]) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 2 - line 13 * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-6;
 [A]US5513785  (CAMPAGNA JR GERALD P [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 30 - line 48 * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 7 * * figures 1,5,8-10 *
by applicantUS2003213823