Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3472551 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3472551



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 88
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
26.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
26.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.02.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
29.01.2019 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
18.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
05.11.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
16.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
28.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 12
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
05.09.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3