Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3472551
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019162502Global Dossier 30.05.2019A1
Priority number Date
FR1600980 20.06.2016
WO2017FR00117 13.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3472551Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
FR1600980 20.06.2016
WO2017FR00117 13.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017220870Global Dossier 28.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1600980 20.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR3052857 22.03.2019B1
FR3052857 22.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1600980 20.06.2016