blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3472669 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201780038515 EP17737337



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019187567Global Dossier 20.06.2019A1
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20190026674Global Dossier 13.03.2019A
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019523439Global Dossier 22.08.2019A
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109416506Global Dossier 01.03.2019A
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3472669Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112018076535 02.04.2019A2
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201810820P 30.01.2019A
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
WO2017FR51649 21.06.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017220930Global Dossier 28.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR3052880 25.01.2019B1
FR3052880 22.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
FR1655753 21.06.2016