Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472669

EP3472669 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MASK FOR SURFACE MICROTEXTURING, AND SURFACE MICROTEXTURING PLANT AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/17]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPTICAL MASK FOR SURFACE MICROTEXTURING, AND SURFACE MICROTEXTURING PLANT AND METHOD
[2019/45]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Change - German titlepublished on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
04.10.2019Change - English titlepublished on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
04.10.2019Change - French titlepublished on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H.E.F.
Rue Benoît Fourneyron
42160 Andrezieux-Boutheon / FR
For all designated states
Université Jean Monnet de Saint-Etienne
10 Rue Tréfilerie
42023 Saint-Etienne Cedex 2 / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique CNRS
3 rue Michel Ange
75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / BICHOTTE, Maxime
18 Avenue Maréchal Foch
67500 Haguenau / FR
02 / JOURLIN, Yves
26 Rue Bergson
42000 Saint-Etienne / FR
03 / DUBOST, Laurent
Le Picard
42330 Chamboeuf / FR
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
3 place de l'Hotel de Ville
CS 70203
42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17737337.021.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017FR51649
Priority number, dateFR2016005575321.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655753
[2019/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017220930
Date:28.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472669
Date:24.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03F1/00, G03F1/68, G03F7/20
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MASKE FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHENMIKROTEXTURIERUNG SOWIE ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENMIKROTEXTURIERUNG[2019/45]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MASK FOR SURFACE MICROTEXTURING, AND SURFACE MICROTEXTURING PLANT AND METHOD[2019/45]
French:SYSTEME ET METHODE DE REALISATION D'UN MASQUE POUR MICRO-TEXTURATION DE SURFACE, INSTALLATION ET METHODE DE MICRO-TEXTURATION DE SURFACE[2019/45]
Former [2019/17]SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCHER MASKE FÜR DIE OBERFLÄCHENMIKROTEXTURIERUNG SOWIE ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENMIKROTEXTURIERUNG
Former [2019/17]SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPTICAL MASK FOR SURFACE MICROTEXTURING, AND SURFACE MICROTEXTURING PLANT AND METHOD
Former [2019/17]SYSTEME ET METHODE DE REALISATION D'UN MASQUE OPTIQUE POUR MICRO-TEXTURATION DE SURFACE, INSTALLATION ET METHODE DE MICRO-TEXTURATION DE SURFACE
Entry into regional phase03.12.2018National basic fee paid 
03.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
03.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]EP0759578  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11,14,15 [I] 4;
 [XI]GB2253925  (POPOVICI DAN, et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,13 * claims 1,9-11 * [I] 4;
 [Y]EP0994378  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]) [Y] 9-11,14,15 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1652009  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 9-11,14,15 * figures 2,5; claims 19,20 *;
 [A]  - VARANASI KRIPA ET AL, "Spatial control in the heterogeneous nucleation of water", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20090831), vol. 95, no. 9, doi:10.1063/1.3200951, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 94101 - 94101, XP012122946 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3200951
by applicant   - XIANHUA WANG; FENG CHEN; HEWEI LIU; WEIWEI LIANG; QING YANG; JINHAI SI; XUN HOU, "Femtosecond laser-induced mesoporous structures on silicon surface", Optics Communications, (20110000), vol. 284, pages 317 - 321
    - YAQI MA; YIFAN XIA; JIANPENG LIU; SICHAO ZHANG; JINHAI SHAO; BING-RUI LU; YIFANG CHEN, "Processing study of SU-8 pillar profiles with high aspect ratio by electron-beam lithography", Microelectronic Engineering, (20160000), vol. 149, pages 141 - 144
    - NASSIR MOJARAD; JENS GOBRECHT; YASIN EKINCI, "Interference lithography at EUV and soft X-ray wavelengths: Principles, methods, and applications", Microelectronic Engineering, (20150000), vol. 143, pages 55 - 63
    - S. R. J. BRUECK, "Optical and Interferometric Lithography - Nanotechnology Enablers", FELLOW, PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (20051000), vol. 93, no. 10
    - BIN AI; YE YU; HELMUTH MÔHWALD; GANG ZHANG; BAI YANG, "Plasmonic films based on colloidal lithography", Advances in Colloid and Interface Science, (20140000), vol. 206, pages 5 - 16
    - ANNA KOSINOVA; DONG WANG; PETER SCHAAF; OLEG KOVALENKO; LEONID KLINGER; EUGEN RABKIN, "Fabrication of hollow gold nanoparticles by dewetting, dealloying and coarsening", Acta Materialia, (20160000), vol. 102, pages 108 - 115
    - N.VIGNESWARAN; FAHMI SAMSURI; BALU RANGANATHAN, PADMAPRIYA, "Recent Advances in Nano Patterning and Nano Imprint Lithography for Biological Applications", Procedia Engineering, (20140000), vol. 97, pages 1387 - 1398