Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468950

EP3468950 - AZA-TANSHINONE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita' degli Studi di Milano
Via Festa del Perdono, 7
20122 Milano / IT
For all designated states
Università Degli Studi Di Trento
Via Calepina 14
38122 Trento / IT
For all designated states
Università Degli Studi di Napoli "Federico II"
Via Domenico Montesano 49
80131 Napoli / IT
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PROVENZANI, Alessandro
Via San Pio X 17
38122 Trento / IT
02 / D' AGOSTINO, Vito Giuseppe
c/o CIBIO - Università degli Studi di Trento
Via Sommarive, 9
38123 Povo, Trento / IT
03 / THONGON, Natthakan
c/o MD Anderson Cancer Center
Department of Leukemia
1515 Holcombe Blvd
Houston, TX 77030 / US
04 / ZUCAL, Chiara
Vicolo del Capitolo 5
38122 Trento / IT
05 / LAL, Preet
c/o Ding Lab
3rd Floor McKinley Building, Box 8076
660 S. Euclid Ave
St. Louis, MO 63110 / US
06 / ADAMI, Valentina
Via Gocciadoro 41
38122 Trento / IT
07 / SENECI, Pierfausto
Piazza Einaudi 3
25015 Desenzano (BS) / IT
08 / MANZONI, Leonardo
Via Pietro da Lissone 57
20851 Lissone (MB) / IT
09 / MARINELLI, Luciana
c/o Scuola di Medicina e Chirurgia
Dipartimento di Farmacia
Università degli Studi di NAPOLI "Federico II"
Via D. Montesano, 49
80131 Napoli / IT
10 / NOVELLINO, Ettore
c/o Dipartimento di Farmacia
Università degli Studi di Napoli Federico II
Via Domenico Montesano n. 49
80131 Napoli / IT
11 / FRAGAI, Marco
Largo Aldo Capitini 5 I. 9
50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT
12 / LUCHINAT, Claudio
Via Fra' Paolo Sarpi 12
50136 Firenze / IT
13 / CEROFOLINI, Linda
Via Fonte Seconda 34H
50023 Impruneta (FI) / IT
14 / FUCCIO, Carmelo
C.so Vittorio Emanuele 11
I-82011 Paolisi (BN) / IT
 [2019/51]
Former [2019/16]01 / PROVENZANI, Alessandro
Via San Pio X 17
38122 Trento / IT
02 / D' AGOSTINO, Vito Giuseppe
Via Marighetto 121
38123 Trento / IT
03 / THONGON, Natthakan
c/o Opera Universitaria Sanbartolomeo
Via Malpensada 140
38123 Trento / IT
04 / ZUCAL, Chiara
Vicolo del Capitolo 5
38122 Trento / IT
05 / LAL, Preet
c/o Opera Universitaria Sanbartolomeo
Via Malpensada 140
38123 Trento / IT
06 / ADAMI, Valentina
Via Gocciadoro 41
38122 Trento / IT
07 / SENECI, Pierfausto
Piazza Einaudi 3
25015 Desenzano (BS) / IT
08 / MANZONI, Leonardo
Via Pietro da Lissone 57
20851 Lissone (MB) / IT
09 / MARINELLI, Luciana
Via Giuseppe Martucci 23
80122 Napoli / IT
10 / NOVELLINO, Ettore
c/o Dipartimento di Farmacia
Università degli Studi di Napoli Federico II
Via Domenico Montesano n. 49
80131 Napoli / IT
11 / FRAGAI, Marco
Largo Aldo Capitini 5 I. 9
50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT
12 / LUCHINAT, Claudio
Via Fra' Paolo Sarpi 12
50136 Firenze / IT
13 / CEROFOLINI, Linda
Via Fonte Seconda 34H
50023 Impruneta (FI) / IT
14 / FUCCIO, Carmelo
C.so Vittorio Emanuele 11
I-82011 Paolisi (BN) / IT
Representative(s)Trupiano, Federica
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17737371.914.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017IB53519
Priority number, dateIT2016UA0436914.06.2016         Original published format: IT UA20164369
[2019/16]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017216732
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468950
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/08
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:AZA-TANSHINON-DERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER THERAPIE[2019/16]
English:AZA-TANSHINONE DERIVATIVES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE IN THERAPY[2019/16]
French:DÉRIVÉS D'AZA-TANSHINONE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS UN TRAITEMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]CN104341481  (FU YIQIU, et al) [A] 1-12 * General formulae I, II, IIA and III Table according to [0103];; examples DA-1 to 20 *;
 [A]  - WANG M ET AL, "Structural elucidation of metabolites of tanshinone I and its analogue dihydrotanshinone I in rats by HPLC@?ESI-MS ", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 878, no. 13-14, ISSN 1570-0232, (20100415), pages 915 - 924, (20100218), XP026991583 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * figures 1,2,8,13 *
 [A]  - TAE-SU JANG ET AL, "Bioassay-guided isolation of fatty acid synthase inhibitory diterpenoids from the roots ofBunge", ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF KOREA, HEIDELBERG, (20120405), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S12272-012-0311-8, ISSN 1976-3786, pages 481 - 486, XP035040191 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12272-012-0311-8