Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472170

EP3472170 - TROGER'S BASE-BASED MONOMERS, AND POLYMERS, METHODS OF MAKING AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
King Abdullah University of Science and Technology
4700 King Abdullah University of
Science and Technology
Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / MA, Xiaohua
4700 King Abdullah University of
Science and Technology
Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA
02 / PINNAU, Ingo
4700 King Abdullah University of
Science and Technology
Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Goulard, Sophie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date17737373.519.06.2017
[2019/17]
WO2017IB53635
Priority number, dateUS201662352055P20.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662352055 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221135
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472170
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D487/08, C08G73/10, B01D53/22, B01D67/00, B01D71/64
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUF TRÖGERSCHER BASE BASIERENDE MONOMERE UND POLYMERE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON[2019/17]
English:TROGER'S BASE-BASED MONOMERS, AND POLYMERS, METHODS OF MAKING AND USES THEREOF[2019/17]
French:MONOMÈRES À BASE D'UNE BASE DE TRÖGER, ET POLYMÈRES, PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2012035327  (UNIV CARDIFF [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-35 * * page 1, lines 2-9 * * examples 1-7 * * page 9, lines 1-11 *;
 [Y]WO2012035328  (UNIV CARDIFF [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-61 * * page 17, lines 1-11 * * examples 1-7 *
 [Y]  - Lee et al.;, "Enhancing the Gas Permeability of Tröger's Base Derived Polyimides of Intrinsic Microporosity - Macromolecules (ACS Publications)", (20160524), URL: http://pubs.acs.org/doi/abs/10.1021/acs.macromol.6b00351, (20170202), XP055341642 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 4148; figure 1 * * page 4150; figure 2 * * page 4151; figures 3-4 * * page 4152; table 2 *
 [Y]  - ZHENGGONG WANG ET AL, "Tröger's Base-Based Microporous Polyimide Membranes for High-Performance Gas Separation", ACS MACRO LETTERS, (20140610), vol. 3, no. 7, doi:10.1021/mz500184z, ISSN 2161-1653, pages 597 - 601, XP055389680 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * page 598; figures 1-2 * * page 599; tables 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/mz500184z
by applicantUS9018270
    - Z. WANG; D. WANG; F. ZHANG; J. JIN, ACS Macro Lett., (20140000), vol. 3, pages 597 - 601
    - Z. G. WANG; D. WANG; J. JIN, Macromolecules, (20140000), vol. 47, pages 7477 - 7483
    - Y. ZHUANG; J. G. SEONG; Y. S. DO; H. J. JO; Z. CUI; J. LEE; Y. M. LEE; M. D. GUIVER, Macromolecules, (20140000), vol. 47, pages 3254 - 3262
    - M. CARTA; R. MAIPASS-EVANS; M. CROAD; Y. ROGAN; J. C. JANSEN; P. BERNARDO; F. BAZZARELLI; N.B. MCKEOWN, Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 303 - 307
    - Q. M. MALIK; S. IJAZ; D C. CRAIG; A. C. TRY, Tetrahedron, (20110000), vol. 67, pages 5798 - 5805
    - S. L. YI; X. H. MA; I. PINNAU; W. J. KOROS, J. Mater. Chem. A, (20150000), vol. 3, pages 22794 - 22806
    - X. MA; O. SALINAS; E. LITWILLER; I. PINNAU, Polyrn. Chem., (20140000), vol. 5, pages 6914 - 6922