Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3442652

EP3442652 - ELECTROMAGNETIC EQUIPMENT FOR INCREASING TISSUE ELASTICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  19.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vladila, Bogdan Constantin
Str. Anastasie Panu nr. 10
Bl. B7 Sc. 2 Apt. 55 Sector 3
031161 Bucuresti / RO
[2019/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/08]
Representative(s)Sach, Greg Robert
Sach & Associates
Siedlungsstrasse 4a
85253 Erdweg / DE
[2019/08]
Application number, filing date17737389.103.04.2017
[2019/08]
WO2017RO00005
Priority number, dateRO2016000025811.04.2016         Original published format: RO 201600258
[2019/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017180005
Date:19.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3442652
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N2/00, A61N2/02
[2019/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/08]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER GEWEBEELASTIZITÄT[2019/08]
English:ELECTROMAGNETIC EQUIPMENT FOR INCREASING TISSUE ELASTICITY[2019/08]
French:ÉQUIPEMENT ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE POUR AUGMENTER L'ÉLASTICITÉ DE TISSU[2019/08]
Entry into regional phase12.11.2018National basic fee paid 
12.11.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.11.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.2018Examination requested  [2019/08]
12.11.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/49]
17.07.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2019/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2012093277  (VLADILA BOGDAN CONSTANTIN [RO]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 23, line 34 - page 25, line 25 *;
 [A]US5935054  (LOOS HENDRICUS G [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]WO2013139915  (VLADILA BOGDAN CONSTANTIN [RO]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0010] , [0036] - [0038] - [0080] - [0084] *;
 [Y]US2011077452  (KOLT STANLEY [US]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]WO2016054502  (NEUROSPRING [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0091]; figures 11,15 *
by applicantRO128805
 WO2009004215