Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3464708

EP3464708 - COATING MATERIALS, AND PERSONAL PROTECTIVE CLOTHING ITEMS COATED WITH THE COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201-2696 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LALGUDI, Ramanathan, S.
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43201-2696 / US
02 / CAIN, Robert, J.
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43201-2696 / US
03 / SHQAU, Krenar
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43201-2696 / US
04 / EDWARDS, Erik, W.
Battelle Memorial Institute
505 King Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43201-2696 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17737660.507.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US36402
Priority number, dateUS201662346588P07.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662346588 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214304
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3464708
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:D06M11/36, D06M11/45, D06M13/513, D06M13/517, D06M15/19, D06M23/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN UND MIT DEN BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN BESCHICHTETE PERSÖNLICHE SCHUTZKLEIDUNG[2019/15]
English:COATING MATERIALS, AND PERSONAL PROTECTIVE CLOTHING ITEMS COATED WITH THE COATING MATERIALS[2019/15]
French:MATÉRIAUX DE REVÊTEMENT, ET VÊTEMENTS DE PROTECTION INDIVIDUELLE REVÊTUS DESDITS MATÉRIAUX DE REVÊTEMENT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
04.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XI]JP2000328439  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,4,7-11,14,15 * WPI abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * * examples 1-6 * * table 1 * [I] 3,5,6,12,13;
 [XI]JP2000119956  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2,4,7-11,14,15 * WPI abstract * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0054] * * examples 1-10 * * tables 1, 2 * [I] 3,5,6,12,13;
 [XI]KR20160011595  (POIZ CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,7-11,14,15 * WPI abstract * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] * [I] 3,5,6,12;
 [XI]CN105200662  (CHEN JIE) [X] 1,2,7-9,15 * claims 1-3 * * EPODOC abstract * [I] 3,5,6
by applicantUS9000203
 US5645883
 US4918210
 US4066592
 US8883935
 US7879935
 WO2008085550
 US8973169
 US8719969
 US8701218
 US8650668
 US8522368
 US8479321
 US8332963
 US8327469
 US8104100
 US7996920
 US7958569
 US7913322
 US7395555
 US7168103
 US2015224349
 WO2015112807
 WO2015081151
 WO2015112810