Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3478819

EP3478819 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR ELECTROPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
06.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zymergen, Inc.
5980 Horton Street Suite 105
Emeryville, California 94608 / US
[2019/19]
Inventor(s)01 / CESAREK, John
803 Boardwalk Place
Redwood City, California 94065 / US
02 / LEE, Travis
1045 Cadillac Way 31
Burlingame, California 94010 / US
03 / HANSEN, Richard
2031 Saint Francis Way
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
 [2019/19]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[2019/19]
Application number, filing date17737709.029.06.2017
[2019/19]
WO2017US40114
Priority number, dateUS20161519954930.06.2016         Original published format: US201615199549
[2019/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018005872
Date:04.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3478819
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12M1/42
[2019/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/19]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROPORATION[2019/19]
English:APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR ELECTROPORATION[2019/19]
French:APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉLECTROPORATION[2019/19]
Entry into regional phase30.01.2019National basic fee paid 
30.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
30.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/19]
30.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO03057819  (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION ET AL.) [X] 23,28 * page 1, line 21 - line 24 * * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 12 * * page 15, line 28 - page 16, line 28 * * page 18, line 25 - line 31 * * page 23, line 9 - line 17 * * page 31, line 23 - page 33, line 9 * * page 42, line 11 - page 43, line 5 * * page 44, line 17 - line 20 * * figures 5,6,10,12-16 * * page 45, line 8 - line 10 * [Y] 1-34;
 [Y]US2006087522  (MULLER-HARTMANN ET AL.) [Y] 1-34 * paragraphs [0002] - [0415] - [0017] , [0026] , [0052] , [0056] , [0057] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2004130339  (YO-HSIN SU ET AL.) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *