Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465839

EP3465839 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING REDUCED ARC TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Lei
1063 Norfolk Drive
San Jose CA 95129 / US
02 / YUN, Hyo, Chang
c/o TE Connectivity Corporation
6900 Paseo Padre Parkway
Fremont CA 94555 / US
03 / DUTTON, Peter, J.
33120 Gull Court
Fremont CA 94555 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date17737930.205.06.2017
[2019/15]
WO2017US35891
Priority number, dateUS20161517385506.06.2016         Original published format: US201615173855
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017214013
Date:14.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465839
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/53, H01R13/533
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT REDUZIERTER BOGENVERFOLGUNG[2019/15]
English:ELECTRICAL DEVICE HAVING REDUCED ARC TRACKING[2019/15]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRIQUE À CHEMINEMENT D'ARC RÉDUIT[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
02.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE10142472  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * figure 1 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 4;
 [X]EP1289075  (HARTING KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * figures 1, 2, 3 *;
 [X]DE19757938  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * figures 2, 3b *;
 [Y]US2013146937  (OMURA KOJI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 8,10 * figures 9, 10 *;
 [A]WO2009012936  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]; RULKENS RUDY [NL]; PELT VAN WILFRED WILHELMUS G) [A] 1-10 * page 19 - page 20 *