Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468940

EP3468940 - ALUMINUM TITANATE COMPOSITIONS, ALUMINUM TITANATE ARTICLES, AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, New York 14831 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BACKHAUS-RICOULT, Monika
57 rue Pasteur
Marlotte
77780 Bourron / FR
02 / TEPESCH, Patrick David
179 Watauga Avenue
Corning New York 14830 / US
03 / VILENO, Elizabeth Marie
53 Wilson Street
Corning New York 14830 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph
Quermann Sturm Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date17737936.913.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37163
Priority number, dateUS201662349249P13.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662349249 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218478
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468940
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/195, C04B35/478, C04B38/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMTITANATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, ALUMINIUMTITANATARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON[2019/16]
English:ALUMINUM TITANATE COMPOSITIONS, ALUMINUM TITANATE ARTICLES, AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE TITANATE D'ALUMINIUM, ARTICLES EN TITANATE D'ALUMINIUM ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
09.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006021308  (MERKEL GREGORY A [US]) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2007259769  (ELLISON ADAM J G [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2007119135  (MIAO WEIGUO [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2016068441  (BACKHAUS-RICOULT MONIKA [FR], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2014028207  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2012217669  (BALSTER JEAN E [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO2008005249  (CORNING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * the whole document *