Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469310

EP3469310 - FILTRATION THRESHOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / GEORGE, Sheri
John F. Welch Technology Centre Pvt. Ltd.
122 EPIP
Phase 2 Hoodi Village
Whitefield Road
Bangalore 560066 / IN
02 / BUREAU, Jean Francois
GEOG - Measurement&Control
50 Industrial Park Road
Lewistown, PA 17044 / US
03 / PUSHPANGATHAN, Ranjith Kundoly
John F. Welch Technology Centre Pvt. Ltd.
122 EPIP
Phase 2 Hoodi Village
Whitefield Road
Bangalore 560066 / IN
04 / GOVINDASAMY, Haribaskar
John F. Welch Technology Centre Pvt. Ltd.
122 EPIP
Phase 2 Hoodi Village
Whitefield Road
Bangalore 560066 / IN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Baker Hughes, A GE Company The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date17737941.914.06.2017
[2019/16]
WO2017US37438
Priority number, dateUS20161518226414.06.2016         Original published format: US201615182264
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218648
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469310
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01D3/032, G10L21/0208, G06F3/05, G06F11/00, H04B15/00, H04B1/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FILTRIERUNGSSCHWELLWERT[2019/16]
English:FILTRATION THRESHOLDING[2019/16]
French:SEUILLAGE EN FILTRATION[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2011018726  (GONZALES ERIC V [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0051] - [0054] - [0060] - [0062] - [0066] , [0073] , [0082] - [0085] - [0097] *;
 [A]EP2744413  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0006]; claims 1,3,4 *;
 [A]US2008129367  (MURATA RONALD N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0055] - [0059] - [0063] - [0066] - [0070] - [0075] - [0093] - [0105] *;
 [A]EP0399180  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 7, line 27 - page 12, line 20 *;
 [A]US2003228065  (KALTSCHMIDT RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0025] - [0036] - [0042] - [0054] - [0083] - [0098]; claims 1,2,27,28 *